Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB468 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2017

                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 468
 (In the Senate - Filed January 12, 2017; February 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extraterritorial jurisdiction of certain
 municipalities in coastal border counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.0235, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding Section 42.021, and except as provided
 by Subsection (d), the extraterritorial jurisdiction of a
 municipality with a population of more than 175,000 located in a
 county that contains an international border and borders the Gulf
 of Mexico terminates two miles from the extraterritorial
 jurisdiction of a neighboring municipality if extension of the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction beyond that limit would:
 (1)  completely surround the corporate boundaries or
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of the neighboring municipality; and
 (2)  limit the growth of the neighboring municipality
 by precluding the expansion of the neighboring municipality's
 extraterritorial jurisdiction.
 (d)  Extraterritorial jurisdiction for a municipality
 subject to this section is determined under Section 42.021 if the
 governing body of the municipality and the governing body of the
 neighboring municipality have each adopted a resolution stating
 that the determination of extraterritorial jurisdiction under
 Section 42.0235(a) is not in the best interest of the municipality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *