S.B. No. 468 AN ACT relating to the extraterritorial jurisdiction of certain municipalities in coastal border counties. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 42.0235, Local Government Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: (a) Notwithstanding Section 42.021, and except as provided by Subsection (d), the extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality with a population of more than 175,000 located in a county that contains an international border and borders the Gulf of Mexico terminates two miles from the extraterritorial jurisdiction of a neighboring municipality if extension of the extraterritorial jurisdiction beyond that limit would: (1) completely surround the corporate boundaries or extraterritorial jurisdiction of the neighboring municipality; and (2) limit the growth of the neighboring municipality by precluding the expansion of the neighboring municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction. (d) Extraterritorial jurisdiction for a municipality subject to this section is determined under Section 42.021 if the governing body of the municipality and the governing body of the neighboring municipality each adopt, on or after June 1, 2017, resolutions stating that the determination of extraterritorial jurisdiction under Section 42.0235(a) is not in the best interest of the municipality. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 468 passed the Senate on April 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 468 passed the House, with amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor