Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB490 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2017

                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 490
 (In the Senate - Filed January 13, 2017; February 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 1; March 27, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 490 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information regarding the number of school counselors
 in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.306, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  The report must also include the number of school
 counselors providing counseling services at each campus.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.006, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The commissioner by rule shall require each school
 district and open-enrollment charter school to report through the
 Public Education Information Management System information
 regarding the availability of school counselors at each campus.
 The commissioner's rules shall require a district or school to
 report the number of full-time equivalent school counselors
 providing counseling services at a campus.  For purposes of this
 subsection, "full-time equivalent school counselor" means 40 hours
 of counseling services a week.  The agency shall maintain the
 information provided in accordance with this subsection.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *