Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB490 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 490


 AN ACT
 relating to school counselors in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.007, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  During the first school year a student is enrolled in a
 high school or at the high school level in an open-enrollment
 charter school, and again during each year of a student's
 enrollment in high school or at the high school level, a school
 counselor shall provide information about postsecondary education
 to the student and the student's parent or guardian.  The
 information must include information regarding:
 (1)  the importance of postsecondary education;
 (2)  the advantages of earning an endorsement and a
 performance acknowledgment and completing the distinguished level
 of achievement under the foundation high school program under
 Section 28.025;
 (3)  the disadvantages of taking courses to prepare for
 a high school equivalency examination relative to the benefits of
 taking courses leading to a high school diploma;
 (4)  financial aid eligibility;
 (5)  instruction on how to apply for federal financial
 aid;
 (6)  the center for financial aid information
 established under Section 61.0776;
 (7)  the automatic admission of certain students to
 general academic teaching institutions as provided by Section
 51.803;
 (8)  the eligibility and academic performance
 requirements for the TEXAS Grant as provided by Subchapter M,
 Chapter 56; [and]
 (9)  the availability of programs in the district under
 which a student may earn college credit, including advanced
 placement programs, dual credit programs, joint high school and
 college credit programs, and international baccalaureate programs;
 and
 (10)  the availability of education and training
 vouchers and tuition and fee waivers to attend an institution of
 higher education as provided by Section 54.366 for a student who is
 or was previously in the conservatorship of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services.
 (b-1)  When providing information under Subsection (b)(10),
 the school counselor must report to the student and the student's
 parent or guardian the number of times the counselor has provided
 the information to the student.
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.306, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  The report must also include the number of school
 counselors providing counseling services at each campus.
 SECTION 3.  Section 42.006, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The commissioner by rule shall require each school
 district and open-enrollment charter school to report through the
 Public Education Information Management System information
 regarding the availability of school counselors at each campus.
 The commissioner's rules shall require a district or school to
 report the number of full-time equivalent school counselors
 providing counseling services at a campus.  For purposes of this
 subsection, "full-time equivalent school counselor" means 40 hours
 of counseling services a week.  The agency shall maintain the
 information provided in accordance with this subsection.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 490 passed the Senate on
 March 29, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 490 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 112,
 Nays 34, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor