Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB495 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/16/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 495


 AN ACT
 relating to certain procedural measures in a suit affecting a
 parent-child relationship to protect a child against child neglect
 or physical or sexual abuse.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 153.004, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (e) and (f) and adding Subsection (g) to read
 as follows:
 (e)  It is a rebuttable presumption that it is not in the best
 interest of a child for a parent to have unsupervised visitation
 with the child if credible evidence is presented of a history or
 pattern of past or present child neglect or [physical or sexual]
 abuse or family violence by:
 (1)  that parent; or
 (2)  any person who resides in that parent's household
 or who is permitted by that parent to have unsupervised access to
 the child during that parent's periods of possession of or access to
 the child [directed against the other parent, a spouse, or a child].
 (f)  In determining under this section whether there is
 credible evidence of a history or pattern of past or present child
 neglect or [physical or sexual] abuse or family violence by a parent
 or other person, as applicable [directed against the other parent,
 a spouse, or a child], the court shall consider whether a protective
 order was rendered under Chapter 85, Title 4, against the parent or
 other person during the two-year period preceding the filing of the
 suit or during the pendency of the suit.
 (g)  In this section:
 (1)  "Abuse" and "neglect" have the meanings assigned
 by Section 261.001.
 (2)  "Family violence" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 71.004.
 SECTION 2.  Section 153.0071(e-1), Family Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Notwithstanding Subsections (d) and (e), a court may
 decline to enter a judgment on a mediated settlement agreement if
 the court finds:
 (1)  that:
 (A) [(1)]  a party to the agreement was a victim
 of family violence, and that circumstance impaired the party's
 ability to make decisions; or
 (B)  the agreement would permit a person who is
 subject to registration under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, on the basis of an offense committed by the person when
 the person was 17 years of age or older or who otherwise has a
 history or pattern of past or present physical or sexual abuse
 directed against any person to:
 (i)  reside in the same household as the
 child; or
 (ii)  otherwise have unsupervised access to
 the child; and
 (2)  that the agreement is not in the child's best
 interest.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a suit affecting the parent-child relationship pending in a trial
 court on the effective date of this Act or filed on or after that
 date. A suit affecting the parent-child relationship in which a
 final order is rendered before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the order was rendered,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 495 passed the Senate on
 March 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 16, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 495 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 9, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor