Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB517 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Garcia S.B. No. 517
 (In the Senate - Filed January 18, 2017; February 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 26, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0,
 1 present not voting; April 26, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 517 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compensation provided to the governing body of
 certain special districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 775.038, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A commissioner of a district is entitled to receive
 compensation in the same manner and amount as are provided by
 Section 49.060, Water Code.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 775.038(a), (b), and (c), Health and
 Safety Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *