Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB528 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/28/2017

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 528
 (In the Senate - Filed January 19, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 28, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 28, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the term of a chief administrative law judge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2003.022(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The office is under the direction of a chief
 administrative law judge appointed by the governor for a two-year
 term that expires on May 15 of each even-numbered year. The chief
 administrative law judge is eligible for reappointment.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2003.022(a), Government Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to a chief administrative law judge
 appointed under that section on or after the effective date of this
 Act.  A chief administrative law judge appointed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before that date and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *