Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB537 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 537
 (In the Senate - Filed January 19, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 27, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 27, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the disclosure of special course fees at
 public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 54, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 54.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.0051.  REQUIRED DISCLOSURE OF COURSE FEES IN COURSE
 CATALOG. Each institution of higher education shall include in the
 institution's course catalog, for each course listed in the
 catalog, a description and the amount of any special course fee,
 including an online access fee or lab fee, to be charged
 specifically for the course.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.0051, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with course catalogs published for the
 2018-2019 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *