Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB537 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 537


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the disclosure of special course fees at
 public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 54, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 54.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.0051.  DISCLOSURE OF COURSE FEES IN COURSE CATALOG.
 Each institution of higher education shall include in the
 institution's online course catalog, for each course listed in the
 catalog, a description and the amount of any special course fee,
 including an online access fee or lab fee, to be charged
 specifically for the course.  If the institution publishes a paper
 course catalog, the institution may publish any fees specifically
 charged for each course using the amounts charged in the most recent
 academic year.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.0051, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with course catalogs published for the
 2018-2019 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 537 passed the Senate on
 May 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 537 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor