By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 539 (In the Senate - Filed January 19, 2017; February 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; March 14, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 14, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 539 By: Zaffirini A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the qualifications for an impartial third party in certain civil disputes. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 154.052(b), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) To qualify for an appointment as an impartial third party under this subchapter in a dispute relating to the parent-child relationship, a person must complete the training required by Subsection (a) and an additional 24 hours of training in the fields of family dynamics, child development, and family law, including a minimum of eight hours of family violence dynamics training developed in consultation with a statewide family violence advocacy organization. SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 154.052, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, a person who satisfies the qualifications to be an impartial third party in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act is not required to comply with the requirements imposed by that section, as amended by this Act, until January 1, 2018, to be qualified to serve as an impartial third party under Subchapter C, Chapter 154, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *