Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB539 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/14/2017

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 539
 (In the Senate - Filed January 19, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 14, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 14, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 539 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications for an impartial third party in
 certain civil disputes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 154.052(b), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  To qualify for an appointment as an impartial third
 party under this subchapter in a dispute relating to the
 parent-child relationship, a person must complete the training
 required by Subsection (a) and an additional 24 hours of training in
 the fields of family dynamics, child development, and family law,
 including a minimum of eight hours of family violence dynamics
 training developed in consultation with a statewide family violence
 advocacy organization.
 SECTION 2.  Notwithstanding Section 154.052, Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, a person who satisfies
 the qualifications to be an impartial third party in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act is not required to
 comply with the requirements imposed by that section, as amended by
 this Act, until January 1, 2018, to be qualified to serve as an
 impartial third party under Subchapter C, Chapter 154, Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *