Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB554 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 554
 (In the Senate - Filed January 20, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 11, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 April 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 554 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice requirements for certain special districts that
 hold board meetings outside the district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49.063, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  This subsection applies only to notice for the
 district's first meeting of each calendar year.  A district that
 does not have a meeting place within the district shall include in
 the notice required under Subsection (a) a description of the
 petition process under Section 49.062(c).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *