Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB578 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    85R31495 MM-F
 By: Lucio, et al. S.B. No. 578
 (Gutierrez, Blanco)
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 578:  No.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to measures to facilitate the delivery of certain mental
 health services for veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 74, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 74.155 to read as follows:
 Sec. 74.155.  NATIONAL CENTER FOR WARRIOR RESILIENCY. (a)
 In this section:
 (1)  "Board" means the board of regents of The
 University of Texas System.
 (2)  "Center" means the National Center for Warrior
 Resiliency.
 (b)  The board shall establish the National Center for
 Warrior Resiliency at The University of Texas Health Science Center
 at San Antonio for purposes of:
 (1)  researching issues relating to the detection,
 prevention, diagnosis, and treatment of combat-related
 post-traumatic stress disorder and comorbid conditions; and
 (2)  providing clinical care to enhance the
 psychological resiliency of military personnel and veterans.
 (c)  The organization, control, and management of the center
 are vested in the board.
 (d)  The board shall:
 (1)  provide for the employment of staff and an
 operating budget for the center; and
 (2)  select a site for the center at The University of
 Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio.
 (e)  The board may solicit, accept, and administer gifts and
 grants from any public or private source for the use and benefit of
 the center.
 (f)  The center may enter into agreements or otherwise
 collaborate with public or private entities, including other public
 institutions of higher education, private or independent
 institutions of higher education, the United States Department of
 Veterans Affairs, the United States Department of Defense, the
 National Institutes of Health, and the Texas Veterans Commission,
 to perform the research functions of the center.
 (g)  An employee of the center is an employee of The
 University of Texas System.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0999 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0999.  VETERAN SUICIDE PREVENTION ACTION PLAN.
 (a)  The commission, in collaboration with the Texas Coordinating
 Council for Veterans Services, the United States Department of
 Veterans Affairs, the Service Members, Veterans, and Their Families
 Technical Assistance Center Implementation Academy of the
 Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration of the
 United States Department of Health and Human Services, veteran
 advocacy groups, medical providers, and any other organization or
 interested party the commission considers appropriate, shall
 develop a comprehensive action plan to increase access to and
 availability of professional veteran health services to prevent
 veteran suicides.
 (b)  The action plan must:
 (1)  identify opportunities for raising awareness of
 and providing resources for veteran suicide prevention;
 (2)  identify opportunities to increase access to
 veteran mental health services;
 (3)  identify funding resources to provide accessible,
 affordable veteran mental health services;
 (4)  provide measures to expand public-private
 partnerships to ensure access to quality, timely mental health
 services;
 (5)  provide for proactive outreach measures to reach
 veterans needing care;
 (6)  provide for peer-to-peer service coordination,
 including training, certification, recertification, and continuing
 education for peer coordinators; and
 (7)  address suicide prevention awareness, measures,
 and training regarding veterans involved in the justice system.
 (c)  The commission shall make specific short-term and
 long-term statutory, administrative, and budget-related
 recommendations to the legislature and the governor regarding the
 policy initiatives and reforms necessary to implement the action
 plan developed under this section.  The short-term recommendations
 must include a plan for state implementation beginning not later
 than September 1, 2019. The initiatives and reforms in the
 short-term plan must be fully implemented by September 1, 2021. The
 long-term recommendations must include a plan for state
 implementation beginning not later than September 1, 2021. The
 initiatives and reforms in the long-term plan must be fully
 implemented by September 1, 2027.
 (d)  The commission shall include in its strategic plan under
 Chapter 2056 the plans for implementation of the short-term and
 long-term recommendations under Subsection (c).
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.