Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB587 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2017

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 587
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
 Border Security; April 11, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 587 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the ability of certain students to enroll full-time in
 courses provided through the state virtual school network.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 30A.002(b), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A student is eligible to enroll full-time in courses
 provided through the state virtual school network only if the
 student:
 (1)  was enrolled in a public school in this state in
 the preceding school year; or
 (2)  [has been placed in substitute care in this
 state,] regardless of whether the student was enrolled in a public
 school in this state in the preceding school year:
 (A)  has been placed in substitute care in this
 state; or
 (B)  is a dependent of a member of the United
 States military who has been deployed or transferred to, or
 otherwise currently resides in, this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Education Agency is required to
 implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose.  If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the agency may,
 but is not required to, implement this Act using other
 appropriations available for the purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *