Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB588 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio, Campbell, Hall S.B. No. 588
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
 Border Security; April 11, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information regarding private employers who have
 veteran's employment preference policies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.024.  INFORMATION REGARDING VETERAN'S EMPLOYMENT
 PREFERENCE POLICIES. The commission shall make available on its
 website a list of each private employer who has provided notice
 under Section 23.002(c), Labor Code, regarding a veteran's
 employment preference policy.
 SECTION 2.  Section 23.002, Labor Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A private employer may provide notice to the Texas
 Workforce Commission or the Texas Veterans Commission that the
 employer has adopted a policy under this section.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.070 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.070.  INFORMATION REGARDING VETERAN'S EMPLOYMENT
 PREFERENCE POLICIES. The commission shall make available on its
 website a list of each private employer who has provided notice
 under Section 23.002(c) regarding a veteran's employment
 preference policy.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *