Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB593 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/05/2017

                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 593
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 5, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the governance of certain housing authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 392.031(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A commissioner may not be an officer or employee of the
 municipality.  A commissioner may be:
 (1)  a tenant of a public project over which the housing
 authority has jurisdiction; or
 (2)  a [person who is a] recipient of housing
 assistance administered through the authority's housing choice
 voucher program or project-based rental assistance program.
 SECTION 2.  Section 392.0331, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b), (b-2), (g), and (h-1) and
 adding Subsection (b-3) to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsections [Subsection] (b-1)
 and (b-2), in appointing commissioners under Section 392.031, a
 municipality with a municipal housing authority composed of five
 commissioners shall appoint at least one commissioner to the
 authority who is a tenant of a public housing project over which the
 authority has jurisdiction.  Except as provided by Subsection
 (b-3) [(b-2)], in appointing commissioners under Section 392.031, a
 municipality with a municipal housing authority composed of seven
 or more commissioners shall appoint at least two commissioners to
 the authority who are tenants of a public housing project over which
 the authority has jurisdiction.
 (b-2)  This subsection applies only to a municipality that
 has a population over 600,000 and is located adjacent to the
 international border of this state. In appointing commissioners
 under Section 392.031, a municipality described by this subsection
 that has a municipal housing authority composed of five
 commissioners shall appoint at least one commissioner to the
 authority who is:
 (1)  a tenant of a public housing project over which the
 authority has jurisdiction; or
 (2)  a recipient of housing assistance administered
 through the authority's housing choice voucher program or
 project-based rental assistance program.
 (b-3)  In appointing commissioners under Section 392.031, a
 municipality that has a population over two million and a municipal
 housing authority composed of seven or more commissioners shall
 appoint at least two commissioners to the authority who are:
 (1)  tenants of a public housing project over which the
 authority has jurisdiction; or
 (2)  recipients of housing assistance administered
 through the authority's housing choice voucher program.
 (g)  A commissioner appointed under this section may not
 participate:
 (1)  in any vote or discussion concerning the
 termination of:
 (A)  the commissioner's occupancy rights in
 public housing;
 (B)  the commissioner's rights to housing
 assistance administered through a housing choice voucher program or
 a project-based rental assistance program; or
 (C)  the rights of any person related in the first
 degree by consanguinity to the commissioner with respect to the
 person's occupancy rights in public housing or right to receive
 housing assistance administered through a housing choice voucher
 program or a project-based rental assistance program; or
 (2)  in a grievance or administrative hearing in which
 the commissioner or a person related in the first degree by
 consanguinity to the commissioner is a party.
 (h-1)  If a commissioner appointed under this section as a
 recipient of housing assistance administered through the
 authority's housing choice voucher program or project-based rental
 assistance program ceases to receive that assistance, a majority of
 the other commissioners shall decide whether to request that a new
 commissioner be appointed.  A majority of the commissioners may
 decide to allow the commissioner to serve the remaining portion of
 the commissioner's term.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *