Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB626 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner, et al. S.B. No. 626
 (In the Senate - Filed January 26, 2017; February 13, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 5, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 5, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 626 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the acquisition of certain real property in conjunction
 with the acquisition of real property for a public use through
 eminent domain procedures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 402.031, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  The statement must disclose that a condemning entity
 that makes an initial offer under Section 21.0113, Property Code,
 that includes real property that the entity does not seek to acquire
 by condemnation shall in the initial offer:
 (1)  separately identify the real property that the
 entity does not seek to acquire by condemnation; and
 (2)  make an offer for the real property that the entity
 does not seek to acquire by condemnation separate from the offer
 made for the real property sought to be acquired by condemnation.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.0114 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0114.  OFFER TO ACQUIRE ADDITIONAL PROPERTY. A
 condemning entity that makes an initial offer under Section 21.0113
 that includes real property that the entity does not seek to acquire
 by condemnation shall in the initial offer:
 (1)  separately identify the real property that the
 entity does not seek to acquire by condemnation; and
 (2)  make an offer for the real property that the entity
 does not seek to acquire by condemnation separate from the offer
 made for the real property sought to be acquired by condemnation.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *