Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB634 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 634


 AN ACT
 relating to reporting requirements for certain skills development
 fund workforce training program providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 303.004, Labor Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 303.004.  FUND REVIEW; REPORT BY CERTAIN WORKFORCE
 TRAINING PROVIDERS REQUIRED.
 SECTION 2.  Section 303.004, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  If the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service or a
 public community or technical college fails to submit a report
 required by Subsection (b)(2):
 (1)  the service or college must refund to the
 comptroller any unexpended state funds received by the service or
 college under this chapter for the state fiscal biennium in which
 the report was due; and
 (2)  the commission may not award any additional grant
 to the service or college under this chapter until the service or
 college has complied with that reporting requirement.
 SECTION 3.  Section 303.004(c), Labor Code, as added by this
 Act, applies beginning with reports due under Section
 303.004(b)(2), Labor Code, not later than October 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 634 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 634 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor