Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB665 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 665
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2017; February 15, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 12, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 12, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 665 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to education requirements for a notary public appointment;
 authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 406, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 406.0045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 406.0045.  REQUIRED EDUCATIONAL COURSE. (a)  An
 applicant for an initial appointment as a notary public shall
 complete an educational course approved by the secretary of state.
 The educational course may be an online, self-study, or classroom
 course.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement the educational course requirement imposed by Subsection
 (a). The rules must:
 (1)  establish the standards for an educational course;
 (2)  establish the procedures for approving an
 educational course; and
 (3)  set a nonrefundable vendor application and renewal
 fee for a vendor of an educational course in an amount sufficient to
 administer this section.
 (c)  The secretary of state may provide an educational course
 to satisfy the requirements of Subsection (a).
 (d)  A fee received by the secretary of state under
 Subsection (b)(3) must be appropriated to and used by the secretary
 of state to administer this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 406.005, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  An application for an initial appointment under this
 section must include a statement that the applicant has completed
 an educational course required by Section 406.0045.
 SECTION 3.  Section 406.006, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 406.006.  QUALIFICATION. An individual qualifies by:
 (1)  properly completing the application form;
 (2)  executing the statement;
 (3)  providing the bond, if required;
 (4)  paying the required filing fees; [and]
 (5)  meeting the eligibility requirements; and
 (6)  providing a statement of completion of an
 educational course if required by Section 406.0045.
 SECTION 4.  Section 406.007(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The applicant must submit to the secretary of state:
 (1)  a fee of $10 for approving and filing the bond of
 the notary public, if required; and
 (2)  a fee of $1 to be appropriated to and used by the
 secretary of state [only] for:
 (A)  hiring an investigator;
 (B)  administering and managing an educational
 course under Section 406.0045(c); and
 (C)  [for] preparing and distributing the
 materials required to be distributed under Section 406.008.
 SECTION 5.  Section 406.011, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Section 406.0045 does not apply to a notary public
 applying for reappointment under this section.
 SECTION 6.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for a notary public appointment received  and
 qualified on or after September 1, 2018. An application received
 and qualified before September 1, 2018, is governed by the law as it
 existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *