By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 666 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2017; February 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 666 By: Creighton A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a sign required to be posted in the restrooms of sexually oriented businesses; creating a criminal offense. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 102, Business & Commerce Code, is amended by adding Subchapter C to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER C. NOTICE REQUIREMENTS ON PREMISES OF SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES Sec. 102.101. POSTING OF CERTAIN SIGN REQUIRED. (a) A sexually oriented business shall post by the sink area in each restroom on the premises one sign that directs a victim of human trafficking to contact the National Human Trafficking Resource Center. Except as provided by Subsection (c), the sign must be 11 inches by 17 inches in size. (b) The attorney general by rule shall prescribe the design, content, and manner of display of the sign required by this section. The sign must: (1) be in both English and Spanish; and (2) include the telephone number and Internet website of the National Human Trafficking Resource Center. (c) The attorney general by rule may require the sign to: (1) be in an additional language other than English or Spanish; (2) be larger than 11 inches by 17 inches in size if the attorney general determines that a larger sign is appropriate; and (3) include other information the attorney general considers necessary and appropriate. Sec. 102.102. CRIMINAL PENALTY. (a) A person commits an offense if the person: (1) is an owner or operator of a sexually oriented business; and (2) fails to post the sign required by Section 102.101 in compliance with that section and rules adopted under that section. (b) An offense under this section is a Class C misdemeanor. If it is shown on the trial of an offense under this section that the person has previously been convicted of an offense under this section, the offense is a Class B misdemeanor. SECTION 2. (a) The attorney general shall adopt rules to implement Section 102.101, Business & Commerce Code, as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2018. (b) Each sexually oriented business shall post the sign required by Section 102.101, Business & Commerce Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2019. SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. (b) Section 102.102, Business & Commerce Code, as added by this Act, takes effect March 1, 2019. * * * * *