Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB693 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 11, 2017      TO: Honorable Robert Nichols, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB693 by Garcia (Relating to three-point seat belts on buses that transport schoolchildren.), As Introduced    No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  Under existing law, a school bus or school activity bus operated or contracted for use by a school district must be equipped with a three-point seat belt for each passenger. This requirement applies to each school bus purchased on or after September 1, 2010 and each school-chartered bus contracted for use on or after September 1, 2011.The bill would amend Transportation Code Sec. 547.701 to expand the type of vehicles to which the three-point seat belt requirement applies to include a "multifunction school activity bus" or a "school-chartered bus." Under the provisions of the bill, the three-point seat belt requirement would not apply to vehicles with a model year of 2017 or earlier. The bill would also repeal language stating that school districts only had to comply with the three-point seat belt requirement to the extent that the Legislature appropriated money to reimburse school districts for complying with the requirement.The bill would take effect September 1, 2017. Local Government Impact According to the Texas Education Agency, school districts could see increased costs if they had purchased vehicles to which the bill applies that do not have a three-point seatbelt.    Source Agencies:701 Texas Education Agency   LBB Staff:  UP, AG, AM, THo    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 11, 2017





  TO: Honorable Robert Nichols, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB693 by Garcia (Relating to three-point seat belts on buses that transport schoolchildren.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Robert Nichols, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB693 by Garcia (Relating to three-point seat belts on buses that transport schoolchildren.), As Introduced

 Honorable Robert Nichols, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation 

 Honorable Robert Nichols, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB693 by Garcia (Relating to three-point seat belts on buses that transport schoolchildren.), As Introduced

SB693 by Garcia (Relating to three-point seat belts on buses that transport schoolchildren.), As Introduced



No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



Under existing law, a school bus or school activity bus operated or contracted for use by a school district must be equipped with a three-point seat belt for each passenger. This requirement applies to each school bus purchased on or after September 1, 2010 and each school-chartered bus contracted for use on or after September 1, 2011.The bill would amend Transportation Code Sec. 547.701 to expand the type of vehicles to which the three-point seat belt requirement applies to include a "multifunction school activity bus" or a "school-chartered bus." Under the provisions of the bill, the three-point seat belt requirement would not apply to vehicles with a model year of 2017 or earlier. The bill would also repeal language stating that school districts only had to comply with the three-point seat belt requirement to the extent that the Legislature appropriated money to reimburse school districts for complying with the requirement.The bill would take effect September 1, 2017.

Local Government Impact

According to the Texas Education Agency, school districts could see increased costs if they had purchased vehicles to which the bill applies that do not have a three-point seatbelt.

Source Agencies: 701 Texas Education Agency

701 Texas Education Agency

LBB Staff: UP, AG, AM, THo

 UP, AG, AM, THo