Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB693 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 693


 AN ACT
 relating to three-point seat belts on buses that transport
 schoolchildren.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 547.701(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  In this subsection, "bus" includes a school bus, [and a]
 school activity bus, multifunction school activity bus, or
 school-chartered bus. A bus operated by or contracted for use by a
 school district for the transportation of schoolchildren shall be
 equipped with a three-point seat belt for each passenger, including
 the operator. This subsection does not apply to:
 (1)  a bus purchased by a school district that is a
 model year 2017 or earlier; or
 (2)  a bus purchased by a school district that is a
 model year 2018 or later if the board of trustees for the school
 district:
 (A)  determines that the district's budget does
 not permit the district to purchase a bus that is equipped with the
 seat belts required by this subsection; and
 (B)  votes to approve that determination in a
 public meeting [applies to:
 [(1)     each bus purchased by a school district on or
 after September 1, 2010, for the transportation of schoolchildren;
 and
 [(2)     each school-chartered bus contracted for use by a
 school district on or after September 1, 2011, for the
 transportation of schoolchildren].
 SECTION 2.  Section 547.701(f), Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  It is the public policy of this state to ensure
 the safety of all students by taking every measure possible to
 protect the lives and well-being of students during transportation
 on a bus to and from school and extracurricular activities,
 including the measure enacted in Section 547.701(e),
 Transportation Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 693 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 24, Nays 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 693 passed the House on
 May 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 96, Nays 48, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor