Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB719 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 719
 (In the Senate - Filed February 2, 2017; February 21, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 8, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 8, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 to collect and study data on the participation of persons with
 intellectual disabilities in workforce education programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.0664(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The board shall collect and maintain data relating to:
 (1)  undergraduate and graduate level participation of
 persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities at
 institutions of higher education, including data regarding
 applications for admission, admissions, retention, graduation, and
 professional licensing; and
 (2)  participation of persons with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities enrolled in a workforce education
 program, including a workforce continuing education program, that
 is eligible for state-appropriated formula funding, including data
 regarding retention, graduation, and professional licensing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *