Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB719 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 719


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 to collect, study, and report certain data regarding workforce
 education programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.0664, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (f), (g), (h), and
 (i) to read as follows:
 (a)  The board shall collect and maintain data relating to:
 (1)  undergraduate and graduate level participation of
 persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities at
 institutions of higher education, including data regarding
 applications for admission, admissions, retention, graduation, and
 professional licensing; and
 (2)  participation of persons with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities enrolled in a workforce education
 program, including a workforce continuing education program, that
 is eligible for state-appropriated formula funding, including data
 regarding retention, graduation, and professional licensing.
 (f)  The board, in consultation with public junior college
 districts, shall identify five junior college districts
 representative of each of the public junior college district peer
 groups as identified by the board, with two selected from the peer
 groups of the largest junior college district, and the geographic
 diversity of this state for the purpose of implementing a pilot
 program to develop and recommend minimum reporting language for
 financial and instructional cost information, including
 information relating to instruction of persons with intellectual
 and developmental disabilities.  In consultation with the
 Legislative Budget Board, the junior college districts
 participating in the program shall study best practices for the
 reporting of revenue and costs allocated across the districts and
 the practicability of disaggregating financial and instructional
 cost information by instructional site within a junior college
 district.  Participants in the study shall consider the following
 data:
 (1)  the number of contact hours, including those
 generated from distance learning;
 (2)  student attainment of completion milestones as
 measured by a performance funding formula established by the
 coordinating board under Section 51.3062(m);
 (3)  the total amount of state appropriations, tax
 revenue, in-district and out-of-district tuition and fee revenue,
 or any other revenue received by the junior college districts and
 the rates or methods by which those revenues are collected;
 (4)  the amount of money expended by the junior college
 districts for programs related to the participation, retention, and
 graduation of persons with intellectual and developmental
 disabilities;
 (5)  a statement of the total amount of money expended
 by the junior college districts;
 (6)  the number of full-time and adjunct faculty; and
 (7)  any other relevant data or reporting
 methodologies.
 (g)  Not later than June 1, 2018, the board and the
 participating junior college districts shall report to the
 Legislative Budget Board the findings from the study under
 Subsection (f), including best practices in reporting,
 methodologies in reporting, and a template for reporting.  Each
 participating junior college district shall report to the board the
 district's financial and instructional costs using the reporting
 template not later than:
 (1)  September 1, 2019, for the state fiscal year
 ending August 31, 2019; and
 (2)  September 1, 2020, for the state fiscal year
 ending August 31, 2020.
 (h)  To the extent of any conflict, Subsections (f) and (g)
 prevail over any rider regarding a reporting requirement following
 the appropriations to Public Community/Junior Colleges in Senate
 Bill No. 1, Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017 (the
 General Appropriations Act).
 (i)  This subsection and Subsections (f), (g), and (h) expire
 December 31, 2020.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 719 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 719 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 8, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor