Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB725 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 725


 AN ACT
 relating to the donation and distribution of food at public
 schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.907 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.907.  DONATION OF FOOD. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Donate" has the meaning assigned by Section
 76.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 (2)  "Nonprofit organization" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 76.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 (b)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 allow a campus to elect to donate food to a nonprofit organization
 through an official of the nonprofit organization who is directly
 affiliated with the campus, including a teacher, counselor, or
 parent of a student enrolled at the campus. The donated food may be
 received, stored, and distributed on the campus. Food donated by
 the campus may include:
 (1)  surplus food prepared for breakfast, lunch, or
 dinner meals or a snack to be served at the campus cafeteria,
 subject to any applicable local, state, and federal requirements;
 or
 (2)  food donated to the campus as the result of a food
 drive or similar event.
 (c)  The type of food donated under this section may include:
 (1)  packaged or unpackaged unserved food;
 (2)  packaged served food if the packaging is in good
 condition;
 (3)  whole, uncut produce;
 (4)  wrapped raw produce; and
 (5)  unpeeled fruit required to be peeled before
 consumption.
 (d)  Food donated under this section to a nonprofit
 organization may be distributed at the campus at any time. Campus
 employees may assist in preparing and distributing the food as
 volunteers for the nonprofit organization.
 (e)  Under this program, a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school may adopt a policy under which the
 district or charter school provides food at no cost to a student for
 breakfast, lunch, or dinner meals or a snack if the student is
 unable to purchase breakfast, lunch, or dinner meals or a snack.
 (f)  The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 725 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 725 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 133,
 Nays 0, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor