Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB726 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 726
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2017; March 13, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water &
 Rural Affairs; March 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to elections held by the Panhandle Groundwater
 Conservation District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 1B(b) and (c), Chapter 19, Acts of the
 55th Legislature, Regular Session, 1957, are amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  A directors' election shall be held on the uniform
 election date in May [third Saturday in January] in each
 odd-numbered [even-numbered] year to elect the appropriate number
 of directors.
 (c)  Except as provided by this section, a directors'
 election is held as provided by [Chapter 51, Water Code, and] the
 [Texas] Election Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *