Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB727 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Garcia, Huffines S.B. No. 727
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2017; February 21, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to excluding certain students from the computation of
 dropout and completion rates for purposes of public school
 accountability.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 39.053(g-1) and (g-2), Education Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (g-1)  In computing dropout and completion rates under
 Subsections (c)(4)(A)(i) and (B)(ii)(a), the commissioner shall
 exclude:
 (1)  students who are ordered by a court to attend a
 high school equivalency certificate program but who have not yet
 earned a high school equivalency certificate;
 (2)  students who were previously reported to the state
 as dropouts, including a student who is reported as a dropout,
 reenrolls, and drops out again, regardless of the number of times of
 reenrollment and dropping out;
 (3)  students in attendance who are not in membership
 for purposes of average daily attendance;
 (4)  students whose initial enrollment in a school in
 the United States in grades 7 through 12 was as unschooled refugees
 or asylees as defined by Section 39.027(a-1);
 (5)  students who are detained at a county
 pre-adjudication or post-adjudication juvenile detention facility
 and:
 (A)  in the district exclusively as a function of
 having been detained at the [a county detention] facility but are
 otherwise not students of the district in which the facility is
 located; or
 (B)  provided services by an open-enrollment
 charter school exclusively as the result of having been detained at
 the facility; and
 (6)  students who are incarcerated in state jails and
 federal penitentiaries as adults and as persons certified to stand
 trial as adults.
 (g-2)  In computing completion rates under Subsection
 (c)(4)(A)(i) [(c)(2)], the commissioner shall exclude students
 who:
 (1)  are at least 18 years of age as of September 1 of
 the school year as reported for the fall semester Public Education
 Information Management System (PEIMS) submission and have
 satisfied the credit requirements for high school graduation;
 (2)  have not completed their individualized education
 program under 19 T.A.C. Section 89.1070(b)(2) and the Individuals
 with Disabilities Education Act (20 U.S.C. Section 1400 et seq.);
 and
 (3)  are enrolled and receiving individualized
 education program services.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *