Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB731 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 731
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2017; February 21, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 March 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14,
 Nays 0; March 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appeal through binding arbitration of certain
 appraisal review board orders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41A.01, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 41A.01.  RIGHT OF APPEAL BY PROPERTY OWNER.  As an
 alternative to filing an appeal under Section 42.01, a property
 owner is entitled to appeal through binding arbitration under this
 chapter an appraisal review board order determining a protest filed
 under Section 41.41(a)(1) or (2) concerning the appraised or market
 value of property if:
 (1)  the property qualifies as the owner's residence
 homestead under Section 11.13; or
 (2)  the appraised or market value, as applicable, of
 the property as determined by the order is $5 [$3] million or less.
 SECTION 2.  Section 41A.03(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  To appeal an appraisal review board order under this
 chapter, a property owner must file with the appraisal district not
 later than the 45th day after the date the property owner receives
 notice of the order:
 (1)  a completed request for binding arbitration under
 this chapter in the form prescribed by Section 41A.04; and
 (2)  an arbitration deposit made payable to the
 comptroller in the amount of:
 (A)  $450, if the property qualifies as the
 owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the appraised
 or market value, as applicable, of the property is $500,000 or less,
 as determined by the order;
 (B)  $500, if the property qualifies as the
 owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the appraised
 or market value, as applicable, of the property is more than
 $500,000, as determined by the order;
 (C)  $500, if the property does not qualify as the
 owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the appraised
 or market value, as applicable, of the property is $1 million or
 less, as determined by the order;
 (D)  $800, if the property does not qualify as the
 owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the appraised
 or market value, as applicable, of the property is more than $1
 million but not more than $2 million, as determined by the order;
 [or]
 (E)  $1,050, if the property does not qualify as
 the owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the
 appraised or market value, as applicable, of the property is more
 than $2 million but not more than $3 million, as determined by the
 order; or
 (F)  $1,550, if the property does not qualify as
 the owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the
 appraised or market value, as applicable, of the property is more
 than $3 million but not more than $5 million, as determined by the
 order.
 SECTION 3.  Section 41A.06(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  To initially qualify to serve as an arbitrator under
 this chapter, a person must:
 (1)  meet the following requirements, as applicable:
 (A)  be licensed as an attorney in this state; or
 (B)  have:
 (i)  completed at least 30 hours of training
 in arbitration and alternative dispute resolution procedures from a
 university, college, or legal or real estate trade association; and
 (ii)  been licensed or certified
 continuously during the five years preceding the date the person
 agrees to serve as an arbitrator as:
 (a)  a real estate broker or sales
 agent [salesperson] under Chapter 1101, Occupations Code;
 (b)  a real estate appraiser under
 Chapter 1103, Occupations Code; or
 (c)  a certified public accountant
 under Chapter 901, Occupations Code; and
 (2)  agree to conduct an arbitration for a fee that is
 not more than:
 (A)  $400, if the property qualifies as the
 owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the appraised
 or market value, as applicable, of the property is $500,000 or less,
 as determined by the order;
 (B)  $450, if the property qualifies as the
 owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the appraised
 or market value, as applicable, of the property is more than
 $500,000, as determined by the order;
 (C)  $450, if the property does not qualify as the
 owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the appraised
 or market value, as applicable, of the property is $1 million or
 less, as determined by the order;
 (D)  $750, if the property does not qualify as the
 owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the appraised
 or market value, as applicable, of the property is more than $1
 million but not more than $2 million, as determined by the order;
 [or]
 (E)  $1,000, if the property does not qualify as
 the owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the
 appraised or market value, as applicable, of the property is more
 than $2 million but not more than $3 million, as determined by the
 order; or
 (F)  $1,500, if the property does not qualify as
 the owner's residence homestead under Section 11.13 and the
 appraised or market value, as applicable, of the property is more
 than $3 million but not more than $5 million, as determined by the
 order.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for binding arbitration under Chapter 41A, Tax Code, that
 is filed on or after the effective date of this Act.  A request for
 binding arbitration under Chapter 41A, Tax Code, that is filed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the request is filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *