S.B. No. 736 AN ACT relating to a report on the sale of retail electric power by the General Land Office. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The General Land Office shall collect information on the sale of electric power by the General Land Office. (b) Not later than September 1, 2018, the General Land Office shall provide to the legislature a report on the information collected under Subsection (a). The report must include the following information for each year: (1) number of participants; (2) aggregate rates; (3) general contract terms; and (4) the extent of any fiscal impact on state resources of administering the program. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 736 passed the Senate on April 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 736 passed the House, with amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor