Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB749 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/02/2017

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 749
 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2017; February 21, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 2, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 2, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain charges by the Bastrop County Water Control and
 Improvement District No. 2; authorizing an increase in a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11001.007(a), Special District Local
 Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board by resolution may impose a monthly charge in
 an amount not to exceed $21 [$15] for each developed or undeveloped
 lot, tract, or reserve in the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *