Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB750 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/03/2017

                    By: Birdwell, Huffines, Rodríguez S.B. No. 750
 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2017; February 21, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions on holders of package store permits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 22.04 and 22.05, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *