By: Perry S.B. No. 753 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2017; February 22, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; April 11, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 11, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to financial accounting and reporting requirements for this state and political subdivisions of this state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 2266, Government Code, is repealed. SECTION 2. Section 112.002, Local Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: (c) A regulation adopted under this section may not be inconsistent with generally accepted accounting principles as established by the Governmental Accounting Standards Board. SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply to financial accounting and reporting by a governmental entity that, immediately before the effective date of this Act, was subject to Chapter 2266, Government Code, as repealed by this Act, beginning with the governmental entity's first fiscal year that begins on or after September 1, 2018. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *