Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB754 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perry S.B. No. 754
 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2017; February 22, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 26, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 26, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extension and modification of a public school
 district depository contract.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 45.205(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A school district and the district's depository bank may
 agree to extend a depository contract for three [two] additional
 two-year terms.  The contract may be modified for each two-year
 extension if both parties mutually agree to the terms.  An extension
 under this subsection is not subject to the requirements of Section
 45.206.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *