Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB762 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 762


 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of offenses involving cruelty to
 animals; increasing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.092, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsections (c-1) and (c-2) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  An offense under Subsection (b)(3), (4), (5), (6), or
 (9) is a Class A misdemeanor, except that the offense is a state
 jail felony if the person has previously been convicted two times
 under this section, two times under Section 42.09, or one time under
 this section and one time under Section 42.09.
 (c-1)  An offense under Subsection (b)(1) or[,] (2) is a
 felony of the third degree, except that the offense is a felony of
 the second degree if the person has previously been convicted under
 Subsection (b)(1), (2), (7), or (8) or under Section 42.09.
 (c-2)  An offense under Subsection (b)(7)[, (7),] or (8) is a
 state jail felony, except that the offense is a felony of the third
 degree if the person has previously been convicted [two times]
 under this section[, two times under Section 42.09,] or [one time
 under this section and one time] under Section 42.09.
 SECTION 2.  Section 821.023(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.  An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 762 passed the Senate on
 May 3, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 24, Nays 7;
 May 26, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 27,
 Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 762 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 126,
 Nays 20, one present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 117, Nays 28, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor