By: Huffman S.B. No. 763 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2017; February 22, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development; March 23, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; March 23, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 763 By: Zaffirini A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the composition of the Texas Historical Commission. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 442.002(b), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The commission is composed of 15 [nine] members appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate. One member must have expertise in archeology, preferably as a professional archeologist, one must have expertise in history, preferably as a professional historian, and one must have expertise in architecture, preferably as a professional architect who is licensed in this state and has expertise in historic preservation and architectural history. The remaining members must represent the general public. A person is [may] not eligible for appointment as [be] a member of the commission if the person or the person's spouse: (1) owns or controls, directly or indirectly, more than a 10 percent interest in a business entity or other organization regulated by the commission or receiving money other than grant money from the commission; (2) uses or receives a substantial amount of tangible goods, services, or money from the commission, other than compensation or reimbursement authorized by law for commission membership, attendance, or expenses; or (3) is employed by or participates in the management of a business entity or other organization regulated by or receiving money other than grant money from the commission. SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act, the governor shall appoint six additional members to the Texas Historical Commission as required by Section 442.002(b), Government Code, as amended by this Act. In appointing the additional members to the commission, the governor shall appoint: (1) two members, including one member with archeology expertise, to terms expiring February 1, 2019; (2) two members, including one member with history expertise, to terms expiring February 1, 2021; and (3) two members, including one member with architecture expertise, to terms expiring February 1, 2023. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *