Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB763 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2017

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 763
 (Frullo)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Texas Historical Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 442.002(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The commission is composed of 15 [nine] members
 appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate.
 One member must have expertise in archeology, preferably as a
 professional archeologist, one must have expertise in history,
 preferably as a professional historian, and one must have expertise
 in architecture, preferably as a professional architect who is
 licensed in this state and has expertise in historic preservation
 and architectural history.  The remaining members must represent
 the general public.  A person is [may] not eligible for appointment
 as [be] a member of the commission if the person or the person's
 spouse:
 (1)  owns or controls, directly or indirectly, more
 than a 10 percent interest in a business entity or other
 organization regulated by the commission or receiving money other
 than grant money from the commission;
 (2)  uses or receives a substantial amount of tangible
 goods, services, or money from the commission, other than
 compensation or reimbursement authorized by law for commission
 membership, attendance, or expenses; or
 (3)  is employed by or participates in the management
 of a business entity or other organization regulated by or
 receiving money other than grant money from the commission.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the governor shall appoint six additional members to
 the Texas Historical Commission as required by Section 442.002(b),
 Government Code, as amended by this Act. In appointing the
 additional members to the commission, the governor shall appoint:
 (1)  two members, including one member with archeology
 expertise, to terms expiring February 1, 2019;
 (2)  two members, including one member with history
 expertise, to terms expiring February 1, 2021; and
 (3)  two members, including one member with
 architecture expertise, to terms expiring February 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.