Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB773 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 773
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2017; February 22, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 23, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0, 1 present not voting; March 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a judge to compel a criminal defendant
 who lacks capacity to take psychoactive medication.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 574.106(a-1), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The court may issue an order under this section only
 if the court finds by clear and convincing evidence after the
 hearing:
 (1)  that the patient lacks the capacity to make a
 decision regarding the administration of the proposed medication
 and treatment with the proposed medication is in the best interest
 of the patient; or
 (2)  if the patient was ordered to receive inpatient
 mental health services by a criminal court with jurisdiction over
 the patient, that treatment with the proposed medication is in the
 best interest of the patient and [either]:
 (A)  the patient presents a danger to the patient
 or others in the inpatient mental health facility in which the
 patient is being treated as a result of a mental disorder or mental
 defect as determined under Section 574.1065; [or]
 (B)  the patient:
 (i)  has remained confined in a correctional
 facility, as defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, for a period
 exceeding 72 hours while awaiting transfer for competency
 restoration treatment; and
 (ii)  presents a danger to the patient or
 others in the correctional facility as a result of a mental disorder
 or mental defect as determined under Section 574.1065; or
 (C)  the patient lacks the capacity to make a
 decision regarding the administration of the proposed medication.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *