Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB78 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2017

                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 78
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 24, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 27, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 78 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of state surplus or salvage data
 processing equipment by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 497.012(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  If the department determines that it is economically
 feasible, the department shall repair or refurbish the surplus or
 salvage data processing equipment. The department shall sell the
 repaired or refurbished data processing equipment, in the following
 order of preference, to:
 (1)  a school district;
 (2)  [,] a state agency;
 (3)  [, or] a political subdivision of the state; or
 (4)  a statewide organization described by Section
 264.603(a), Family Code, or a local volunteer advocate program, as
 defined by Section 264.601, Family Code, for use by children or
 youth in foster care [in that relative order of preference].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *