Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB790 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 790     85R3121 DMS-D   By: Miles         Health & Human Services         3/2/2017         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) launched two new womens health programs on July 1, 2016: Healthy Texas Women program and Family Planning Program. These programs offer health and family planning services to women in Texas.  The Women's Health Advisory Committee (committee) was created by an amendment to S.B. 200 in 2015. The committee is charged with providing recommendations to the commission on the consolidation of women's health programs. The committee is made largely of providers of the new women's health programs which gives providers and HHSC the opportunity to directly interact with each other on the implementation of these programs.   Under S.B. 200, the committee would be abolished on September 1, 2017. With the new programs still less than a year old, S.B. 790 extends the life of the committee another two years until September 1, 2019, to provide more time for HHSC and the providers on the committee to directly discuss and improve the new programs.   As proposed, S.B. 790 amends current law relating to the continuation of the women's health advisory committee.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 531.02221(e), Government Code, to provide that the womens health advisory committee is abolished and this section expires September 1, 2019, rather than September 1, 2017.    SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2017.                

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 790
85R3121 DMS-D By: Miles
 Health & Human Services
 3/2/2017
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 790

85R3121 DMS-D

By: Miles

 

Health & Human Services

 

3/2/2017

 

As Filed

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) launched two new womens health programs on July 1, 2016: Healthy Texas Women program and Family Planning Program. These programs offer health and family planning services to women in Texas.



The Women's Health Advisory Committee (committee) was created by an amendment to S.B. 200 in 2015. The committee is charged with providing recommendations to the commission on the consolidation of women's health programs. The committee is made largely of providers of the new women's health programs which gives providers and HHSC the opportunity to directly interact with each other on the implementation of these programs.

 

Under S.B. 200, the committee would be abolished on September 1, 2017. With the new programs still less than a year old, S.B. 790 extends the life of the committee another two years until September 1, 2019, to provide more time for HHSC and the providers on the committee to directly discuss and improve the new programs.

 

As proposed, S.B. 790 amends current law relating to the continuation of the women's health advisory committee.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 531.02221(e), Government Code, to provide that the womens health advisory committee is abolished and this section expires September 1, 2019, rather than September 1, 2017. 

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2017.