Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB790 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 790


 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of the women's health advisory
 committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 531.02221(e), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  The women's health advisory committee is abolished and
 this section expires September 1, 2019 [2017].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 790 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 790 passed the House on
 May 20, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 83, Nays 52, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor