By: Miles S.B. No. 793 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2017; February 22, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 3, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 2; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 793 By: Miles A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to restrictions on the location and operation of concrete crushing facilities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 382.065, Health and Safety Code, is amended by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows: (a) The commission by rule shall prohibit the operation of a concrete crushing facility within 440 yards of the following types of buildings or facilities: (1) a building in use as a single or multifamily residence, school, or place of worship; (2) an area designated as a public park by action of a governmental entity; or (3) after notice is given to the operator of the concrete crushing facility, an outdoor recreational facility used for organized sporting events during the time the recreational facility is used for those events [at the time the application for a permit to operate the facility at a site near the residence, school, or place of worship is filed with the commission]. (a-1) Rules adopted under this section must provide for the manner and time of giving notice to an operator of a concrete crushing facility under Subsection (a)(3). (a-2) The measurement of distance for purposes of this section is the shortest distance between [subsection shall be taken from the point on] the concrete crushing facility and a building, public park, or outdoor recreational facility described by Subsection (a) [that is nearest to the residence, school, or place of worship toward the point on the residence, school, or place of worship that is nearest the concrete crushing facility]. (b) A rule adopted under this section [Subsection (a)] does not apply to a concrete crushing facility: (1) at a location for which commission authorization for the operation of a concrete crushing facility was in effect on September 1, 2001; (2) at a location that satisfies the distance requirements of Subsection (a) at the time the application for the initial authorization for the operation of that facility at that location is filed with the commission, provided that the authorization is granted and maintained, regardless of whether a building, public park, or outdoor recreational facility described by Subsection (a) [single or multifamily residence, school, or place of worship] is subsequently built or put to use within 440 yards of the facility; or (3) that: (A) uses a concrete crusher: (i) in the manufacture of products that contain recycled materials; and (ii) that is located in an enclosed building; and (B) is located: (i) within 25 miles of an international border; and (ii) in a municipality with a population of not less than 6,100 but not more than 20,000. SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only to an application for a permit to operate a concrete crushing facility that is filed on or after the effective date of this Act. An application for a permit filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date of filing, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *