Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB801 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 801


 AN ACT
 relating to the instructional material list and supplemental
 instructional materials adopted by the State Board of Education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.023(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Each instructional material on the list must be:
 (1)  free from factual errors;
 (2)  suitable for the subject and grade level for which
 the instructional material was submitted; and
 (3)  reviewed by academic experts in the subject and
 grade level for which the instructional material was submitted.
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.035(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter,
 the State Board of Education may adopt supplemental instructional
 materials that are not on the list adopted under Section 31.023.
 The State Board of Education may adopt supplemental instructional
 material under this section only if the instructional material:
 (1)  contains material covering one or more primary
 focal points or primary topics of a subject in the required
 curriculum under Section 28.002, as determined by the State Board
 of Education;
 (2)  is not designed to serve as the sole instructional
 material for a full course;
 (3)  meets applicable physical specifications adopted
 by the State Board of Education; [and]
 (4)  is free from factual errors;
 (5)  is suitable for the subject and grade level; and
 (6)  is reviewed by academic experts in the subject and
 grade level.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 31.023(b) and 31.035(a), Education
 Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to an instructional
 material list or supplemental instructional material adopted on or
 after the effective date of this Act. An instructional material
 list or supplemental instructional material adopted before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the
 instructional material list or supplemental instructional material
 was adopted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 801 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 26, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 26,
 Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 801 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 106,
 Nays 38, two present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 78, Nays 62, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor