Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB805 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 805
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2017; February 22, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
 Border Security; April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays
 0; April 24, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 805 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duties of the Texas Women Veterans Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 434.203, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 434.203.  COORDINATOR.  (a)  The executive director
 shall designate a women veterans coordinator for this state.
 (b)  The coordinator or the coordinator's designee shall
 serve as a liaison between state and federal agencies and
 organizations that provide benefits and services to women veterans.
 SECTION 2.  Section 434.204, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 434.204.  GENERAL PROGRAM DUTIES. The program shall:
 (1)  provide assistance to the women veterans of this
 state as provided by this subchapter;
 (2)  perform outreach functions to improve the
 awareness of women veterans of their eligibility for federal and
 state veterans' benefits and services;
 (3)  assess the needs of women veterans with respect to
 benefits and services;
 (4)  review programs, research projects, and other
 initiatives designed to address the needs of the women veterans of
 this state;
 (5)  make recommendations to the executive director
 regarding the improvement of benefits and services to women
 veterans; [and]
 (6)  incorporate issues concerning women veterans in
 commission planning regarding veterans' benefits and services; and
 (7)  in collaboration with appropriate state agencies,
 provide information to women veterans on services and resources
 provided by state or federal agencies and organizations to women
 veterans.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *