Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB805 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 805


 AN ACT
 relating to Texas women veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 434.203, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 434.203.  COORDINATOR.  (a)  The executive director
 shall designate a women veterans coordinator for this state.
 (b)  The coordinator or the coordinator's designee shall
 serve as a liaison between state and federal agencies and
 organizations that provide benefits and services to women veterans.
 SECTION 2.  Section 434.204, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 434.204.  GENERAL PROGRAM DUTIES. The program shall:
 (1)  provide assistance to the women veterans of this
 state as provided by this subchapter;
 (2)  perform outreach functions to improve the
 awareness of women veterans of their eligibility for federal and
 state veterans' benefits and services;
 (3)  assess the needs of women veterans with respect to
 benefits and services;
 (4)  review programs, research projects, and other
 initiatives designed to address the needs of the women veterans of
 this state;
 (5)  make recommendations to the executive director
 regarding the improvement of benefits and services to women
 veterans; [and]
 (6)  incorporate issues concerning women veterans in
 commission planning regarding veterans' benefits and services; and
 (7)  in collaboration with appropriate state agencies,
 provide information to women veterans on services and resources
 provided by state or federal agencies and organizations to women
 veterans.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter E, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 434.212, 434.213, and 434.214 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 434.212.  WOMEN VETERANS REPORT. Not later than
 November 1 of each even-numbered year, the commission shall submit
 to the governor, lieutenant governor, and legislature a report on
 women veterans in this state. The report may be delivered
 electronically and must:
 (1)  estimate the:
 (A)  number of women veterans in this state;
 (B)  number of women veterans who contact the
 commission for assistance; and
 (C)  number of women veterans who receive
 assistance from the commission, the Texas Workforce Commission, the
 Department of State Health Services, and other state agencies;
 (2)  identify the unique problems faced by women
 veterans; and
 (3)  recommend policy proposals, initiatives, and
 funding levels to address the problems identified in Subdivision
 (2).
 Sec. 434.213.  WOMEN VETERANS COMMUNITY OUTREACH CAMPAIGN.
 The women veterans coordinator designated under Section 434.203, in
 consultation with the Governor's Commission for Women, the United
 States Department of Veterans Affairs, and any other appropriate
 agency, shall conduct a community outreach campaign to:
 (1)  provide information relating to and increase
 awareness of benefits and services available to women veterans;
 (2)  improve access to benefits and services for women
 veterans;
 (3)  increase participation of women veterans in
 programs that provide benefits and services;
 (4)  provide information on the significant
 contributions of women veterans in this state; and
 (5)  provide information relating to and increase
 awareness of support groups and other organizations relating to
 family services, including services for women veterans who are
 single parents.
 Sec. 434.214.  APPLICATION FOR STATE AGENCY PROGRAMS,
 SERVICES, OR ASSISTANCE. (a)  This section applies to a state
 agency in the executive branch of state government, including a
 health and human services agency, that provides to adult women in
 this state a program, a service, or assistance, including the
 Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program, the supplemental
 nutrition assistance program, the women's health program,
 Medicaid, the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women,
 Infants, and Children, and a housing program or service or housing
 assistance.
 (b)  A state agency shall include in each application for a
 program, a service, or assistance provided by the agency to adult
 women:
 (1)  a space to indicate whether the applicant is a
 veteran; and
 (2)  model language informing the applicant that she
 may be entitled to additional services because of her veteran
 status.
 (c)  The commission shall develop the model language
 required on an application under Subsection (b)(2). The language
 must include a link to the veterans website established under
 Section 434.102 or, for an online application, a hyperlink to that
 website.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.065.  WOMEN VETERANS DAY. (a)  June 12 is Women
 Veterans Day to recognize the role of women in the military forces
 and to commemorate the sacrifices of and valor displayed by Texas
 women veterans.
 (b)  Women Veterans Day shall be regularly observed by
 appropriate programs and activities.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than November 1, 2018, the women
 veterans coordinator shall establish the women veterans community
 outreach campaign as required under Section 434.213, Government
 Code, as added by this Act, and the Texas Veterans Commission shall
 adopt any rules necessary to implement the campaign.
 SECTION 6.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas
 Veterans Commission shall develop the model application language
 required by Section 434.214, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 and post that information on the commission's Internet website.
 (b)  Not later than March 1, 2018, each state agency subject
 to Section 434.214, Government Code, as added by this Act, shall
 modify the agency's application for programs, services, or
 assistance as necessary to implement that section.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 805 passed the Senate on
 May 2, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 805 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor