Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB807 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 807


 AN ACT
 relating to choice of law and venue for certain construction
 contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 272, Business & Commerce
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 272. LAW APPLICABLE TO CERTAIN CONSTRUCTION CONTRACTS [FOR
 CONSTRUCTION OR REPAIR OF REAL PROPERTY IMPROVEMENTS]
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 272, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Section 272.0001 and amending Sections 272.001
 and 272.002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 272.0001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "construction
 contract" means a contract, subcontract, or agreement entered into
 or made by an owner, architect, engineer, contractor, construction
 manager, subcontractor, supplier, or material or equipment lessor
 for the design, construction, alteration, renovation, remodeling,
 or repair of, or for the furnishing of material or equipment for, a
 building, structure, appurtenance, or other improvement to or on
 public or private real property, including moving, demolition, and
 excavation connected with the real property.  The term includes an
 agreement to which an architect, engineer, or contractor and an
 owner's lender are parties regarding an assignment of the
 construction contract or other modifications thereto.
 Sec. 272.001.  VOIDABLE CONTRACT PROVISION. (a)  This
 section applies only to a construction contract concerning [that is
 principally for the construction or repair of an improvement to]
 real property located in this state.
 (b)  If a construction contract or an agreement collateral to
 or affecting the construction contract contains a provision making
 the contract or agreement or any conflict arising under the
 contract or agreement subject to another state's law, litigation in
 the courts of another state, or arbitration in another state, that
 provision is voidable by a [the] party obligated by the contract or
 agreement to perform the work that is the subject of the
 construction contract [or repair].
 Sec. 272.002.  INAPPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER [CONTRACT
 PRINCIPALLY FOR CONSTRUCTION OR REPAIR OF REAL PROPERTY
 IMPROVEMENTS]. This chapter does not apply to a construction
 [(a)     For purposes of this chapter, a contract is principally for
 the construction or repair of an improvement to real property
 located in this state if the contract obligates a party, as the
 party's principal obligation under the contract, to provide labor
 or labor and materials as a general contractor or subcontractor for
 the construction or repair of an improvement to real property
 located in this state.
 [(b)     For purposes of this chapter, a contract is not
 principally for the construction or repair of an improvement to
 real property located in this state if the] contract that:
 (1)  is a partnership agreement or other agreement
 governing an entity or trust;
 (2)  provides for a loan or other extension of credit
 and the party promising to perform the work that is the subject of
 the construction contract [construct or repair the improvement] is
 doing so as part of the party's agreements with the lender or other
 person who extends credit; or
 (3)  is for the management of real property or
 improvements and the obligation to perform the work that is the
 subject of the construction contract [construct or repair the
 improvement] is part of that management.
 [(c)     Subsections (a) and (b) do not provide an exclusive
 list of the situations in which a contract is or is not principally
 for the construction or repair of an improvement to real property
 located in this state.]
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a contract, or an agreement collateral to or affecting a contract,
 entered into on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 contract, or an agreement collateral to or affecting a contract,
 entered into before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this
 Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 807 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 807 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 135,
 Nays 8, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor