Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB813 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/03/2017

                    By: Hughes, et al. S.B. No. 813
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2017; February 27, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 1; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to recovery of damages, attorney's fees, and costs related
 to frivolous regulatory actions by state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 105, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 105. FRIVOLOUS CLAIM OR REGULATORY ACTION BY STATE AGENCY
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 105.002, Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.002.  RECOVERY OF FEES, EXPENSES, AND ATTORNEY'S
 FEES FOR FRIVOLOUS CLAIM.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 105, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 105.005 and 105.006 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 105.005.  CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FRIVOLOUS REGULATORY
 ACTION. (a)  A claimant may bring an action against a state agency
 if the state agency takes a regulatory action against the claimant
 that is frivolous, unreasonable, or without foundation.
 (b)  In an action brought under this section, a claimant may
 recover, in addition to all other costs allowed by law or rule, the
 damages caused by the state agency's frivolous regulatory action,
 reasonable attorney's fees, and court costs.
 Sec. 105.006.  RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS IN
 FRIVOLOUS REGULATORY ACTION. A person may recover, in addition to
 all other costs allowed by law or rule, reasonable attorney's fees
 and costs incurred in defending against a frivolous regulatory
 action during an administrative proceeding and judicial review of
 that proceeding if:
 (1)  the person prevails in the judicial review of an
 administrative proceeding; and
 (2)  the state agency is unable to demonstrate that the
 agency has good cause for the regulatory action.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a regulatory action taken on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A regulatory action taken before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law applicable to the regulatory action
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *