Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB813 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 813


 AN ACT
 relating to recovery of damages, attorney's fees, and costs related
 to frivolous regulatory actions by state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 105, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 105. FRIVOLOUS CLAIM OR REGULATORY ACTION BY STATE AGENCY
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 105.002, Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.002.  RECOVERY OF FEES, EXPENSES, AND ATTORNEY'S
 FEES FOR FRIVOLOUS CLAIM.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 105, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 105.005 and 105.006 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 105.005.  CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FRIVOLOUS REGULATORY
 ACTION. (a)  A claimant may bring an action against a state agency
 if the state agency takes a regulatory action against the claimant
 that is frivolous, unreasonable, or without foundation.
 (b)  A claimant may bring an action under this section only
 after the claimant has exhausted the claimant's administrative
 remedies with respect to the regulatory action against the
 claimant.
 (c)  In an action brought under this section, a claimant may
 recover, in addition to all other costs allowed by law or rule, the
 damages caused by the state agency's frivolous regulatory action,
 reasonable attorney's fees, and court costs.
 Sec. 105.006.  RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS IN
 FRIVOLOUS REGULATORY ACTION. A person may recover, in addition to
 all other costs allowed by law or rule, reasonable attorney's fees
 and costs incurred in defending against a frivolous regulatory
 action during an administrative proceeding and judicial review of
 that proceeding if:
 (1)  the person prevails in the judicial review of an
 administrative proceeding; and
 (2)  the state agency is unable to demonstrate that the
 agency has good cause for the regulatory action.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a regulatory action taken on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A regulatory action taken before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law applicable to the regulatory action
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 813 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 3;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 27, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 27,
 Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 813 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 131,
 Nays 7, two present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 27, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor