Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB826 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 826


 AN ACT
 relating to the sequencing of required English language arts
 courses and mathematics courses in schools and conforming changes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.025(b-2), Education Code, as amended
 by Chapters 211 (H.B. 5) and 214 (H.B. 2201), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 (b-2)  In adopting rules under Subsection (b-1), the State
 Board of Education shall:
 (1)  provide for a student to comply with the
 curriculum requirements for an advanced English course under
 Subsection (b-1)(1) [taken after successful completion of English
 I, English II, and English III], for an advanced mathematics course
 under Subsection (b-1)(2) [taken after the successful completion of
 Algebra I and geometry], and for any advanced science course under
 Subsection (b-1)(3) by successfully completing a course in the
 appropriate content area that has been approved as an advanced
 course by board rule or that is offered as an advanced course for
 credit without board approval as provided by Section 28.002(g-1);
 and
 (2)  allow a student to comply with the curriculum
 requirements for the third and fourth mathematics credits under
 Subsection (b-1)(2) or the third and fourth science credits under
 Subsection (b-1)(3) by successfully completing an advanced career
 and technical course designated by the State Board of Education as
 containing substantively similar and rigorous academic content.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 826 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 22, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 826 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 17, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor