Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB830 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 830


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of accounting statements by mortgage
 servicers for certain loans secured by a lien on residential real
 property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 5, Finance Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 397 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 397. ACCOUNTING STATEMENTS FOR CERTAIN HOME LOANS REQUIRED
 Sec. 397.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "mortgage
 servicer" has the meaning assigned by Section 51.0001, Property
 Code.
 Sec. 397.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter
 applies only to a loan secured by a first or subordinate lien on
 residential real property that is not:
 (1)  a federally related mortgage loan, as defined by
 12 U.S.C. Section 2602;
 (2)  a loan that is made by a credit union regulated by
 the Credit Union Department;
 (3)  a loan that is primarily for business, commercial,
 or agricultural purposes, or for temporary financing, such as a
 construction loan, as referred to under 12 U.S.C. Section 2602; or
 (4)  a loan that is directly financed and serviced by a
 relative within the second degree of consanguinity or affinity of
 the borrower.
 Sec. 397.003.  ANNUAL ACCOUNTING STATEMENT. (a)  A mortgage
 servicer shall provide to the borrower an annual statement in
 January of each year for the term of the loan. The statement must be
 provided by mail, postmarked on or before January 31, and sent to
 the borrower at the borrower's last known address.
 (b)  The statement required by Subsection (a) must clearly
 and conspicuously state the following information:
 (1)  the amount of each payment that was received by the
 mortgage servicer as payment toward the loan during the preceding
 calendar year;
 (2)  how each payment described by Subdivision (1) was
 applied to the borrower's account, including information showing
 the amount of each payment that was applied to:
 (A)  the borrower's principal obligation under
 the loan;
 (B)  the interest charged on the loan;
 (C)  any escrow account associated with the loan;
 and
 (D)  any fee or other charge assessed against the
 borrower during the preceding calendar year; and
 (3)  the outstanding balance of the borrower's
 principal obligation under the loan.
 Sec. 397.004.  RECOURSE OF BORROWER FOR MORTGAGE SERVICER'S
 FAILURE TO TIMELY PROVIDE STATEMENT; LIABILITY OF MORTGAGE
 SERVICER.  (a)  If a borrower does not receive an annual statement
 within the time prescribed by Section 397.003(a), the borrower may
 request the statement from the mortgage servicer by sending a
 request to that effect to the mortgage servicer by certified mail,
 return receipt requested.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), if, after
 receiving a request under Subsection (a), the mortgage servicer
 fails to provide the statement to the borrower on or before the 25th
 day after the date the mortgage servicer receives the request:
 (1)  the borrower is not liable for any fees,
 penalties, or late charges, or any other amounts except for any
 principal and interest that may be due for the preceding calendar
 year; and
 (2)  if the mortgagee is not the mortgage servicer, the
 mortgage servicer is liable for paying the mortgagee:
 (A)  any amount for which the borrower is no
 longer liable under Subdivision (1); and
 (B)  any fee or other charge assessed against the
 borrower by the mortgagee as a result of, or consequential damages
 arising out of, the mortgage servicer's failure to comply with this
 section.
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply if, before the borrower
 requests an annual statement under this section, the mortgage
 servicer sends a default notice to the borrower at the borrower's
 last known address by certified mail, return receipt requested.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 830 passed the Senate on
 May 10, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 5, one present
 not voting; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on
 May 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 5, one present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 830 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 96,
 Nays 51, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor