Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB850 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2017

                    By: Huffines, Buckingham S.B. No. 850
 (In the Senate - Filed February 13, 2017; February 27, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 27, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 850 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the mandatory spinal screening of public and private
 school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The executive commissioner, in cooperation with the
 Texas Education Agency, shall adopt rules for the mandatory spinal
 screening of children [in grades 6 and 9] attending public or
 private schools.  In adopting rules under this subsection, the
 executive commissioner shall consider the most recent nationally
 accepted and peer-reviewed scientific research in determining the
 appropriate ages for conducting the spinal screening.  The
 department shall coordinate the spinal screening program with any
 other screening program conducted by the department on those
 children.
 (b-1)  The executive commissioner, in cooperation with the
 Texas Education Agency, by rule shall develop a process to notify a
 parent, managing conservator, or guardian of:
 (1)  the screening requirement;
 (2)  the purposes of and reasons for the screening
 requirement, including prevention of painful scoliosis correction
 surgery and medical risks to the child if screening is declined;
 (3)  the noninvasive nature of the method used to
 conduct the screening; and
 (4)  the method for declining to comply with the
 screening requirement through the use of an exemption described by
 Section 37.002(b).
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The executive commissioner of the Health
 and Human Services Commission shall adopt rules under Section
 37.001, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later
 than January 1, 2018.
 (b)  This Act applies beginning with the 2018-2019 school
 year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *